Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Donna Marshall filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Leigh Frizzell Hayes presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Checklist | |
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Waiver and Consent of Discharge | |
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Estate Tax Closing Letter | |
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Discharge | |
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time to File Discharge | |
June 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Petition for Extension to File Discharge | |
June 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Determining Homestead Property | |
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time to File Discharge | |
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Consent | |
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Consent and Waiver of Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.