Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Radiant Soft Sol Inc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Corinne Rosner, Mark Goldstein, against Toriatech Inc, represented by Corinne Rosner, Mark Goldstein, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryCa Damages Monetary |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Final Judgment
Date: November 10, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Images Purged | |
November 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Final Judgment | |
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion for Entry of Final Judgment | |
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Interest | |
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
August 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Order on Motion Protective Order, Granted in Part, Denied in Part | |
August 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Memorandum in Support copy | |
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Opposition | |
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Minutes | |
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.