Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Citimortgage Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Adam Menices, City Of Fort Myers Florida, Eric Stansbery, Unknown Parties, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Elisabeth Adams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Motion in Opposition
Date: February 04, 2009Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 16, 2008Complaint
Date: December 26, 2007Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 23, 2008Voluntary Dismissal
Date: August 23, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
March 04, 2010 | Hearing |
CANCELLED-Record Activity CADR Abatement
Judge: Adams, Elisabeth |
|
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Bankruptcy Documents | |
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Status | |
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Lack of Prosecution | |
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion in Opposition | |
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Attached Documents | |
November 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion for Default and Default Issued (Joint) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.