Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gmac Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Hieu Mai, Huy Mai, Magnolia Lakes At Gateway Homeowners Association Inc, Magnolia Landing Master Association Inc, Unknown Parties, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: August 27, 2008Request for Production
Date: March 04, 2008Complaint
Date: December 26, 2007Request for Admissions
Date: March 04, 2008Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 23, 2008Answer
Date: January 15, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2009 | Hearing | ||
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements Issued | |
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title (Recorded) | |
May 01, 2009 | Hearing | ||
May 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale Issuedback to Pltf | |
May 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale | |
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale Issued, Copy to Gulf Coast Business Review | |
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Final Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.