Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chase Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Philip Orsi, against Deborah Thompson, represented by Philip Orsi, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2007 |
CategoryCa Damages Monetary |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Images Purged | |
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Final Judgment | |
March 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Indebtedness/Amount Due | |
March 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment | |
March 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
February 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Military Service/Military Service | |
February 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion for Default and Default (Issued) | |
December 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.