Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Washington Mutual Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Ruol Charles, Unknown Parties, Unknown Parties In Possession 1, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2007 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Complaint
Date: December 21, 2007Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 04, 2008Ordergranting motion for writ of possession
Date: July 11, 2008Affidavit in Support of the Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 04, 2008Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 03, 2008Assignment of Bid
Date: June 13, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Ordergranting motion for writ of possession | |
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion for Writ of Possession | |
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
June 13, 2008 | Hearing | ||
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Assignment of Bid | |
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title Issued | |
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements Issued | |
June 02, 2008 | Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.