Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Washington Mutual Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Ari Antunes, Unknown Parties, Unknown Parties In Possession 1, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2007 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Complaint
Date: December 21, 2007Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 03, 2008Affidavit in Support of the Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 31, 2008Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 31, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title (Recorded) | |
June 09, 2008 | Hearing | ||
June 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements Issued | |
June 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title Issuedneed $.70 Doc Stamp | |
May 27, 2008 | Hearing | ||
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale Issuedwent back to pltf for $100.00 | |
May 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale | |
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale Issued, Copy to News-Press |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.