Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Washington Mutual Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Gardens At Beachwalk Condominium Association Inc, Samuel Russo, Unknown Spouse Of Samuel Russo, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Joseph C Fuller presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2007 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale
Date: May 19, 2009Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 10, 2008Motion to Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: May 15, 2009Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale
Date: January 21, 2009Assignment of Bid
Date: June 24, 2009Complaint
Date: December 21, 2007Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 18, 2008Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 06, 2008Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 23, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title (Recorded) | |
July 06, 2009 | Hearing | ||
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements Issued | |
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title IssuedNeed $0.70 doc stamps | |
June 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Assignment of Bid | |
June 22, 2009 | Hearing | ||
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale Issued | |
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.