Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Germania Garcia, John Doe, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Rufino Garcia, Unknown Parties, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with J. Frank Porter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2007 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company against Rufino Garcia and Germania Garcia in Lee County, Florida. The complaint alleges that on September 19, 2006, Rufino Garcia and Germania Garcia executed a promissory no...
Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 08, 2008Demand
Date: January 28, 2008Affidavit in Support of the Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 06, 2009Assignment of Bid
Date: May 24, 2013Final Judgment
Date: April 25, 2013Motion to Withdraw as Counsel
Date: January 03, 2011Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 06, 2009Response to Request For Production
Date: January 21, 2009Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 21, 2008Response to Request for Admissions
Date: January 21, 2009Complaint
Date: December 21, 2007Request for Production
Date: January 28, 2008Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 28, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Unclaimed Registry Funds Escheated per F.S. 717.113 | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice Pursuant to F.S. 717.113 | |
June 11, 2013 | Hearing |
Certificate of Title
Judge: No, Judge Assigned |
|
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements Issued | |
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title Issued | |
May 29, 2013 | Hearing |
Online Foreclosure Sale
Judge: No, Judge Assigned |
|
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale IssuedTo pltf $91,100 | |
May 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Assignment of Bid | |
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.