Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
National City Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Steven Reagan, Unknown Parties, Unknown Spouse Of Steven Frank Reagan, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2007 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Complaint
Date: December 21, 2007Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 30, 2008Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 31, 2008Affidavit in Support of the Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 31, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2009 | Hearing | ||
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title Issued | |
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements Issued | |
March 03, 2009 | Hearing | ||
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale Issued | |
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
February 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale | |
January 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
January 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale Issued, Copy to Gulf Coast Business Review | |
January 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Additional Costs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.