Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pnc Mortgage, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Derek Benson, Jane Doe, John Doe, Unknown Parties, Unknown Spouse Of Derek R Benson, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2007 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by National City Bank against Derek R. Benson in Lee County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges that on September 7, 2006, Benson executed a promissory note and a purchase money mortgage, which were recorded o...
Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 18, 2008Order Setting Case for Docket Sounding & Referral to GM11/3/2010 at 8:30am in Courtroom 1-B
Date: September 03, 2010Final Judgment
Date: November 21, 2011Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 01, 2010Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 24, 2011Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 17, 2011Motion (Emergency)to Continue Trial
Date: April 18, 2011Motion to Withdraw as Counsel
Date: January 21, 2011Motion to Withdraw as Counsel
Date: November 29, 2010Request for Production
Date: August 23, 2010Request for Admissionsw/notice
Date: August 23, 2010Amended Complaint
Date: April 14, 2010Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 28, 2008Complaint
Date: December 21, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2012 | Hearing |
Certificate of Title
Judge: No, Judge Assigned |
|
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements Issued | |
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title (Recorded) | |
December 22, 2011 | Hearing |
Online Foreclosure Sale
Judge: No, Judge Assigned |
|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale IssuedSold to the Plaintiff for $164,900 | |
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale | |
December 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale Issued | |
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Final Judgment | |
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.