Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kevin Ritchie filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Lisa S Porter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLisa S Porter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryPaternity |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Report and Recommended Final Judgment | |
March 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Minutes | |
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion for Referral to General Magistrate | |
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Trial and Order of Referral to General Magistrate 3-20-08 @ 2:30pm | |
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Completion of Parenting Program | |
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Reports | |
February 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Completion of Parenting Program | |
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Default Issued | |
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Jury Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.