Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Daniels Preserve Homeowners Association Inc, John Peck, Joyce Peck, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a legal action filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas as the plaintiff against John Peck, Joyce Peck, and other unknown parties. The purpose of the complaint is to foreclose a mortgage on a property located in Lee County, Flo...
Memorandum
Date: August 05, 2008Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 14, 2008Memorandum
Date: March 12, 2008Complaint
Date: December 28, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Check Mailed from Civil #14955 and #14956 | |
March 06, 2009 | Hearing | ||
March 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title Issued | |
March 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements Issued | |
February 23, 2009 | Hearing | ||
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Balance of Sale Proceeds | |
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Deposit of Sale Proceeds | |
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale IssuedSold to Cape Acquisition #2 LLC for $120,000.00 | |
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
February 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.