Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lynda Cox filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Leigh Frizzell Hayes presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategorySummary Administration, Estate $1000 Or More |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Order Admitting Will | |
September 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice to Creditors | |
August 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Judicial Memorandum | |
July 24, 2007 | Docket Event | Authenticated Transcript - Recorded | |
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event | Memorandum from Judge Winesett | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Consent | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Petition for Summary Administration | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Authenticated Transcript - Recorded | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Death Certificate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.