Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Household Finance Corporation Iii, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lawrence Rolfe, against Judy Mcelwee, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryCa Damages Monetary |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Images Purged | |
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Check Mailed from Civil | |
March 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Clerk Request for Disbursement of Funds | |
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Order Dissolving Writ of Garnishment | |
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment | |
May 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Answer of Garnishee | |
May 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Order for Continuing Writ of Garnishment | |
April 09, 2007 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuing Writ of Garnishment | |
March 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued on Def in amt of $26,485.23 for atty Rolfe - retd atty via mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.