Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
April Rushing, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Curtright Truitt, Gregory Bosseler, against Wayne Murphy, represented by Curtright Truitt, Gregory Bosseler, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryCa Auto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Images Purged | |
November 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
November 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal | |
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Settlement Agreement | |
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Mediator Report | |
September 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Order Appointing and Directing Mediation set for 10/14/08 at 9am | |
August 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Subpoena Served | |
July 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Hearing 7-21-08 | |
May 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing 7-21-08 @ 3pm | |
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Subpoena Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.