Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Chase Home Finance Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Anjanette Futie, Aquatic Architechs Inc, Edward Futie, John Doe, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by CHASE HOME FINANCE, LLC against the defendants EDWARD A. FUTIE A/K/A EDWARD FUTIE, AQUATIC ARCHITECHS, INC, ANJANETTE FUTIE, JOHN DOE, and JANE DOE. The complaint alleges that on December 9, 2005, EDWAR...
Complaint
Date: December 29, 2006Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: February 26, 2007Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 22, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Default Issued by Judge | |
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Dropping Party | |
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Military Service/Military Service | |
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Motion for Default and Default (Issued) | |
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing4-23-07 @ 9:30am | |
February 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment | |
February 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attorneys Time | |
February 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attorneys Fees | |
February 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defenses |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.