Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gmac Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Jessica Stilwell, Samir Cabrera, Unknown Parties, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by GMAC Mortgage, LLC against Samir Cabrera and Jessica Stilwell in the Circuit Court of the 20th Judicial Circuit in Lee County, Florida. The complaint alleges that on June 30, 2006, Cabrera and Stilwell ...
Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 24, 2007Final Judgment (Summary)
Date: May 14, 2007Complaint
Date: December 29, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned Served | |
September 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearanceby Atty. Elder | |
August 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued and frwd to LCSD | |
July 03, 2007 | Hearing | ||
July 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements Issuedwent back to the pltf therefore no disbursements | |
July 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title Issued | |
June 21, 2007 | Hearing | ||
June 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale Issuedwent back to the pltf for $100.00 | |
June 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
June 18, 2007 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.