Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Giorgi Margebadze filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Lee Ann Schreiber presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Military Service/Military Service | |
July 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Diligent Search | |
July 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Judicial Memorandum | |
April 26, 2006 | Docket Event | Document Filed lease agreement | |
April 26, 2006 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Corroborating Witness | |
March 02, 2006 | Docket Event | Special Interrogatories | |
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Motion for Default and Default (Issued) | |
February 01, 2006 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Action | |
January 17, 2006 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.