Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Leo Fendick, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Darrin Schutt, John Lakin, against Manuel Alvarado, represented by Darrin Schutt, John Lakin, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with R. Thomas Corbin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryCa Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Voluntary Dismissal
Date: August 02, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Images Purged | |
August 06, 2010 | Hearing |
CANCELLED-Case Dismissed CADR Abatement
Judge: Corbin, R Thomas |
|
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
July 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution and Hearing Notice | |
May 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Lack of Prosecution | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Minutes | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
April 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing 5-18-09 at 9am | |
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.