Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Asset Acceptance Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Melody Babineau, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryCa Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Answer of Garnishee
Date: August 28, 2015Answer of Garnishee
Date: July 22, 2015Answer of Garnishee
Date: July 07, 2015Answer of Garnishee
Date: June 22, 2015Answer of Garnishee
Date: May 26, 2015Answer of Garnishee
Date: March 06, 2015Answer of Garnishee
Date: April 20, 2015Memorandumfrom MBA
Date: September 21, 2015Answer of Garnishee
Date: August 21, 2015Answer of Garnishee
Date: August 03, 2015Answer of Garnishee
Date: June 08, 2015Motion for Final Judgment in Garnishment
Date: October 01, 2014Answer of Garnishee
Date: May 07, 2015Answer of Garnishee
Date: April 06, 2015Answer of Garnishee
Date: March 19, 2015Answer of GarnisheeCopy
Date: November 19, 2014Answer of Garnishee
Date: September 08, 2014Answer of Garnishee
Date: February 20, 2015Answer of Garnishee
Date: November 04, 2014Final Judgment (Garnishment)
Date: October 16, 2014Answer of Garnishee
Date: February 10, 2015Answer of Garnishee
Date: January 26, 2015Answer of Garnishee
Date: January 12, 2015Voluntary Dismissal
Date: April 06, 2010Answer of Garnishee
Date: December 22, 2014Answer of Garnishee
Date: September 22, 2014Answer of Garnishee
Date: October 17, 2014Answer
Date: March 31, 2006Answer of Garnishee
Date: August 29, 2013Answer of Garnishee
Date: October 03, 2014Request for Production
Date: September 10, 2007Answer of Garnishee
Date: August 06, 2014Answer of Garnishee
Date: July 18, 2014Answer of Garnishee
Date: July 10, 2014Request for Production
Date: April 26, 2006Affidavit in Opposition
Date: August 22, 2013Answer of Garnishee (W/Demand)
Date: February 14, 2011Bank of America - Order for Writ of Garnishment Is
Date: December 01, 2010Notice of Production from Non-Party
Date: December 17, 2008Request for Admissions
Date: April 26, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Dissolution of Writ of Garnishment | |
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Memorandumfrom MBA | |
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Answer of Garnishee | |
August 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Copy ofNotice of Severance from Garnishee | |
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Answer of Garnishee | |
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Answer of Garnishee | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Answer of Garnishee | |
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Answer of Garnishee | |
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Answer of Garnishee | |
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Answer of Garnishee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.