Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jason Rios, Lisa Rios, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jack Morgan, William Merchant, against Peter Rosenberg, represented by Jack Morgan, William Merchant, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryCa Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Images Purged | |
June 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order of Dismissal | |
June 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal | |
May 09, 2006 | Docket Event | Mediator Report | |
April 04, 2006 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
March 31, 2006 | Docket Event | Order Appointing and Directing Mediation | |
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Motion to abate | |
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Hearing 3-6-06 @ 3pm | |
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Motion for Protective Order | |
January 26, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing 3-6-06 @ 3pm |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.