Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sunset Key Condominium Association Inc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Christian Van Hise, against Wci Communities Inc, represented by Christian Van Hise, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryCa Damages Monetary |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Images Purged | |
March 20, 2007 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
September 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
August 14, 2006 | Docket Event | Order Substituting | |
August 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Motion for Substitution | |
August 01, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance of Co Counsel for Plaintiff | |
April 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Motion to abate | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.