Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Windermere Cove Llc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Bruce Essen, Frank Pavese, against Nancy Carney, Nick Hilger, Pine Island Title Insurance Agency Inc, represented by Bruce Essen, Frank Pavese, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2005 |
CategoryCa Damages Monetary |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Images Purged | |
June 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event | Mediation Agreement | |
March 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation 4-5-07 @ 1pm | |
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition 1-10-07 | |
June 02, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Hearing 6-5-06 | |
May 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
May 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing 6-5-06 @ 9:30am | |
May 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
May 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Response to Request For Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.