Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sundahl Jr, Philip J, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with Metz, Larry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2022 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
PAID $3.00 ON RECEIPT 2872938, FULLY PAID $3.00 2872938 Fully Paid |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
COPY REQUEST COPY SENT 9.27.23; SASE PROVIDED |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
PAID $12.00 ON RECEIPT 2862781, FULLY PAID $12.00 2862781 Fully Paid |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
COPY REQUEST COPIES PREPARED 8.18.23; SASE PROVIDED,SENT 8/21/23 |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMIN ORDER L-2022-36-B DATED JULY 17, 2023 METZ, LARRY SENIOR COVERAGE JUDGE 8, Per Admin Order L-2022-36-B dated July 17, 2023 |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO CLAIM | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS AMENDED |
|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED INVENTORY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.