Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ajax Mortgage Loan Trust 2021 G Mortgage Backed Securities Series 2021 G By U S Bank National Association As Indenture Trustee, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with METZ, LARRY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 09, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILSON UNKNOWN SPOUSE, DALE
Date: June 21, 2022PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 2746763, FULLY PAID
Date: June 17, 2022CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: June 03, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO WILSON, DEBRA J / 06/13/2022
Date: July 05, 2022VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM
Date: May 09, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILSON, DALE
Date: June 21, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT I, / 05/17/2022
Date: June 02, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILSON, DENNIS A
Date: May 10, 2022SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: May 09, 2022NOTICE OF DISMISSAL
Date: August 15, 2022ORDER
Date: June 17, 2022SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: June 17, 2022MOTION
Date: June 15, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT II, / 05/17/2022
Date: June 02, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVICE AS TO WILSON, DENNIS A
Date: June 02, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: May 09, 2022ORDER
Date: June 01, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT II,
Date: May 10, 2022MOTION
Date: May 16, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT I,
Date: May 10, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILSON UNKNOWN SPOUSE, DALE A
Date: May 10, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILSON, DEBRA J
Date: May 10, 2022PAID $1,976.50 ON RECEIPT 2737125, FULLY PAID
Date: May 10, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILSON, DALE A
Date: May 10, 2022TEXT
Date: May 09, 2022LIS PENDENS
Date: May 09, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: May 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS |
|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO WILSON, DEBRA J / 06/13/2022 WILSON, DEBRA J 06/13/2022 |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILSON UNKNOWN SPOUSE, DALE WILSON UNKNOWN SPOUSE, DALE |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILSON, DALE WILSON, DALE |
|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 2746763, FULLY PAID $20.00 2746763 Fully Paid |
|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND CASE STYLE DUE TO SCRIVENER'S ERROR // GRANTED |
|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT I, / 05/17/2022 UNKNOWN TENANT I, 05/17/2022 NKA NYENIA MOYA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.