Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by White, in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with CURINGTON, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMay 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
BOND DISCHARGED
Date: September 03, 2021ORDER SETTING CASES RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE
Date: July 13, 2021ARREST AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 01, 2021ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - NOT APPOINTED
Date: June 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Cancelled TRI - JURY SELECTION / TRIAL WEEK on 9/13/2021 8:00:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Cancelled COP - CHANGE OF PLEA on 9/8/2021 9:00:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | BOND DISCHARGED | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ANNOUNCEMENT OF NO INFORMATION | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASES FOR TRIAL & COP | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
CONTINUED TO 9/13/2021 8:00 AM TRI - JURY SELECTION / TRIAL WEEK 9/13/2021 8:00 AM CURINGTON, EMILY |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT PRESENT | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
CONTINUED TO 9/8/2021 9:00 AM COP - CHANGE OF PLEA 9/8/2021 9:00 AM CURINGTON, EMILY |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | PER COURT | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASES FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.