Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
White filed a(n) Mental Health case against Schierer, James, in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with SINGELTARY, G RICHARD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSINGELTARY, G RICHARD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryMental Health |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Disposed by Judge | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PETITION FOR CONTINUING TREATMENT ORDER | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
SET ON MHH1 - MENTAL HEALTH HEARINGS-INMATE DOCKET 10/15/2021 BEGINNING AT 8:45 AM MHH1 - MENTAL HEALTH HEARINGS-INMATE 10/15/2021 8:45 AM |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Cancelled MHH1 - MENTAL HEALTH HEARINGS-INMATE on 10/8/2021 8:45:00 AM due to | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
SET ON MHH1 - MENTAL HEALTH HEARINGS-INMATE DOCKET 10/8/2021 BEGINNING AT 8:45 AM MHH1 - MENTAL HEALTH HEARINGS-INMATE 10/8/2021 8:45 AM |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITION FOR TREATMENT ORDER AND ORDER OF APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PSYCHOLOGICAL EVALUATION | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.