Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rodriguez Jr, Oscar Enrique filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with RADA, CARY F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRADA, CARY F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO GUARDIAN | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAID $36.00 ON RECEIPT 2753180, FULLY PAID $36.00 2753180 Fully Paid |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO GUARDIAN | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Petitioner: SUAREZ VILLEGAS, LOURDES | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposed by Judge | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF GUARDIAN ADVOCACY | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN ADVOCATE | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES FROM | |
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELISOR, FOR PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN ADVOCATE AND NOTICE |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER ALLOWING REMOTE SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.