Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with MOSLEY, DAN R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOSLEY, DAN R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF SERVICE AS TO HARGROVE, JANAE HARGROVE, JANAE |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMIN ORDER L-2021-22-C DATED FEBRUARY 23RD, 2022 MOSLEY, DAN R WELKE, BRIAN J Per Admin Order L-2021-22-C dated February 23rd, 2022 |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
120 DAY NOTICE OF DISMISSAL MAILED TO PET ONLY |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE REQUIRING COMPLIANCE FROM FAMILY COURT CASE MANAGEMENT | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | 120 DAYS TO SERVE OTHER PARTY | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $315.16 ON RECEIPT 2681206, FULLY PAID $315.16 2681206 Fully Paid |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING PARENTING COURSE | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET PRO SE | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.