Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with WELKE, BRIAN J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissed, Settled or Disposed After Hearing | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAY 10, 2022, AT 10:00 A.M. VIA ZOOM |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMIN ORDER L-2021-22-C DATED FEBRUARY 23RD, 2022 MOSLEY, DAN R WELKE, BRIAN J Per Admin Order L-2021-22-C dated February 23rd, 2022 |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PETITION ONLY SIGNED BY ONE PARTY, REQUIRES BOTH SIGNATURES TO CLOSE/DISPOSE |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE REQUIRING COMPLIANCE FROM FAMILY COURT CASE MANAGEMENT | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER ROSOLEK, DEBORAH JILL ROSOLEK, DEBORAH JILL |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET PRO SE | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $422.28 ON RECEIPT 2677401, FULLY PAID $422.28 2677401 Fully Paid |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | VITAL STATISTIC FORM NOT SIGNED (FOR FUTURE USE) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.