Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with TAKAC, MICHAEL G presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | COPY OF VITAL STATISTICS FORM | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND ORDER ADOPTING AND INCORPORATING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposed by Judge | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE HEARING SET 12/28/21 @ 1:30 PM VIA ZOOM |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO SALAZAR MARTINEZ, MONICO DANIEL SALAZAR MARTINEZ, MONICO DANIEL |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FOR TRIAL SENT TO FCCM |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT // PROPOSED DEFAULT | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE REQUIRING COMPLIANCE FROM FAMILY COURT CASE MANAGEMENT | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.