Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Miller Jr, Levi John, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Hogan Dedicated Services Llc, Hogan Transports Inc, Hubbard, Steven Lawrence, in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with TAKAC, MICHAEL G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTAKAC, MICHAEL G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: September 20, 2022JOINT STIPULATION
Date: November 01, 2022FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: October 19, 2022ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Date: November 02, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: August 09, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2022MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT
Date: August 17, 2022REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: August 04, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: July 22, 2022NOTICE
Date: June 06, 2022CERTIFICATION SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY
Date: May 16, 2022NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: April 28, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 27, 2022REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 27, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 28, 2022NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: May 05, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 27, 2022REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 27, 2022REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 27, 2022REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: April 27, 2022JOINT STIPULATION
Date: April 14, 2022REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: April 27, 2022ORDER
Date: April 20, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: April 14, 2022ORDER
Date: April 12, 2022NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF
Date: February 23, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: January 10, 2022REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 17, 2022ORDER
Date: January 07, 2022NOTICE THAT CAUSE IS AT ISSUE
Date: January 04, 2022OBJECTION
Date: January 04, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: December 21, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: January 07, 2022MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: December 14, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 21, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: October 28, 2021MOTION
Date: October 28, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: December 01, 2021REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: October 28, 2021ORDER
Date: December 03, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: October 28, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: December 01, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 28, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY HOGAN TRANSPORTS INC,,HUBBARD, STEVEN LAWRENCE
Date: October 28, 2021DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS
Date: October 28, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF
Date: October 28, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED TO HOGAN TRANSPORTS INC,
Date: September 30, 2021PAID $420.00 ON RECEIPT 2681300, FULLY PAID
Date: September 30, 2021SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: September 30, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED TO HUBBARD, STEVEN LAWRENCE
Date: September 30, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: September 30, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF HOGAN DEDICATED SERVICES LLC & STEVEN LAWRENCE HUBBARD WITH PREJUDICE |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION WITH PREJUDICE |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT // PLAINTIFF'S ACCEPTANCE OF DEFENDANTS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF OFFER OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.