Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Croft, Kelli, Croft, Nicholas J, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against United Property And Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with MOSLEY, DAN R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 01, 2022FINAL ORDER
Date: December 19, 2022JOINT STIPULATION
Date: December 15, 2022MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT
Date: November 11, 2022VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: December 08, 2022COVER LETTER DATED
Date: December 15, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 21, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 29, 2022NOTICE
Date: December 15, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: July 28, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: July 19, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: July 21, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: November 03, 2022NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF
Date: July 21, 2022NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: September 06, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: July 29, 2022REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: July 21, 2022NOTICE OF FILING
Date: July 19, 2021ORDER
Date: July 20, 2022REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: June 30, 2021SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: June 30, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY,
Date: January 14, 2022ORDER
Date: November 04, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: August 05, 2021MOTION
Date: August 05, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: September 24, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY,
Date: July 01, 2021MOTION
Date: August 30, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: June 30, 2021PAID $410.00 ON RECEIPT 2658923, FULLY PAID
Date: July 01, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER DATED | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
November 11, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION SET FOR NOVEMBER 10, 2022 AT 10:30 AM |
|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.