Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Kingman, Jenice, Kingman, Joseph, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against St Johns Insurance Company Inc, in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with WELKE, BRIAN J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: October 18, 2021MOTION
Date: August 30, 2021PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: August 23, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: August 23, 2021ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 23, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: July 27, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 27, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY INC,
Date: July 27, 2021DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS
Date: July 27, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF
Date: July 27, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED TO ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY INC,
Date: July 01, 2021PAID $410.00 ON RECEIPT 2658798, FULLY PAID
Date: July 01, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: June 30, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 30, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2021SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: June 30, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: July 27, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST DISCOVERY REQUEST |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
PRIVILEGE LOG // DEFT'S |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE AND OBJECTIONS |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES AND OBJECTIONS |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY INC, ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY INC, |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MARY B THOMAS ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.