Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kopacsy, Tracey, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against 7 Eleven Inc, South Hancock Ltd, in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with TAKAC, MICHAEL G presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: November 09, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: August 27, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: December 03, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 18, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: November 11, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: September 01, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: October 08, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: July 22, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF
Date: June 21, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: September 13, 2021FINAL ORDER
Date: December 13, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: July 30, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: September 22, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: May 13, 2022NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: May 10, 2022JOINT STIPULATION
Date: December 09, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2022ORDER
Date: December 02, 2021CERTIFICATION SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY
Date: October 04, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: August 15, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: August 25, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: August 18, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: October 11, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: September 27, 2021CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION
Date: October 25, 2021DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS
Date: July 15, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 01, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO 7 ELEVEN INC, / 06/25/2021
Date: July 02, 2021ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL
Date: August 30, 2021JOINT STIPULATION
Date: August 30, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 05, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 16, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: June 18, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 05, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED TO SOUTH HANCOCK LTD,
Date: June 21, 2021NOTICE OF FILING
Date: July 22, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 30, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: July 22, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: July 30, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: July 20, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY
Date: July 15, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY SOUTH HANCOCK LTD,
Date: July 20, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: July 22, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: July 15, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO SOUTH HANCOCK LTD, / 06/30/2021
Date: July 07, 2021DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS
Date: June 18, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 15, 2021SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: June 18, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF
Date: July 15, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: June 18, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED TO 7 ELEVEN INC,
Date: June 21, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 18, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: June 18, 2021PAID $420.00 ON RECEIPT 2655559, FULLY PAID
Date: June 21, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 18, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 18, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: June 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MICHAEL C. TYSON, ESQ. ON BEHALF OF 7-ELEVEN, INC. & SOUTH HANCOCK LTD. |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION OCTOBER 14, 2022 AT 10:00 AM VIA ZOOM |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.