Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
White filed a(n) Mental Health case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with RADA, CARY F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRADA, CARY F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryMental Health |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF IMPENDING END TO RISK PROTECTION ORDER | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON RISK PROTECTION ORDER | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON RISK PROTECTION ORDER | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Disposed by Judge | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | RISK PROTECTION COURT SHEET | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | RISK PROTECTION ORDER GRANTED | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
SET ON HRG - HEARING DOCKET 9/17/2021 BEGINNING AT 12:00 PM HRG - Hearing 9/17/2021 12:00 PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.