Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with TAKAC, MICHAEL G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTAKAC, MICHAEL G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $5.00 ON RECEIPT 2650910, FULLY PAID $5.00 2650910 Fully Paid |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF VITAL STATISTICS FORM | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF NAME CHANGE REPORT OF FINAL JUDGMENT | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Disposed by Judge | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF CHANGE OF NAME FILED AND RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF NAME CHANGE (MINOR CHILD) AND ORDER ADOPTING AND INCORPORATING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DILIGENT SEARCH FLORIDA PUTATIVE FATHER REGISTRY | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET 5/27/21 @ 11:30 AM |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMIN ORDER L-2020-39-A DATED FEBRUARY 24, 2021 RADA, CARY F TAKAC, MICHAEL G Per Admin Order L-2020-39-A dated February 24, 2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.