Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Horner, Michael, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Universal Insurance Holdings Inc Dba Universal Insurance Holding Company Of Florida Dba Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with TAKAC, MICHAEL G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTAKAC, MICHAEL G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: September 14, 2022MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: May 26, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR
Date: December 14, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: February 16, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: November 10, 2021NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF
Date: June 21, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: May 26, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 07, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 16, 2022MOTION
Date: March 16, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 16, 2022NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: March 07, 2022NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: February 22, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 16, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: January 19, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: January 06, 2022REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: December 14, 2021ORDER
Date: December 03, 2021(PTC)
Date: June 03, 2019NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: November 10, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: September 29, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: September 29, 2021INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 02, 2019MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: September 21, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: July 13, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: September 09, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: September 02, 2021PAID $400.00 ON RECEIPT 2673040, FULLY PAID
Date: August 27, 2021CERTIFIED COPY
Date: August 27, 2021COVER LETTER DATED
Date: August 20, 2021ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO
Date: August 20, 2021CERTIFIED COPY
Date: August 27, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: July 13, 2021MOTION
Date: June 21, 2021CHECK LIST
Date: March 22, 2019REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 26, 2021NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF
Date: February 03, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF
Date: January 20, 2021DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS
Date: January 20, 2021REQUEST
Date: October 07, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: August 31, 2020CASE INFORMATION SHEET FROM JUDGE'S OFFICE
Date: January 27, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: January 23, 2020LETTER
Date: January 21, 2020CASE INFORMATION SHEET FROM JUDGE'S OFFICE
Date: January 10, 2020MOTION
Date: December 20, 2019NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTE SC
Date: December 02, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: June 03, 2019NOTICE
Date: June 03, 2019NOTICE
Date: June 03, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: June 03, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: May 03, 2019CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO ATTY FOR DEFT
Date: May 01, 2019(MEDIATION)
Date: May 01, 2019OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE
Date: May 01, 2019CURRENT CONTACT INFORMATION AS TO PLTF
Date: May 01, 2019STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: March 22, 2019STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY
Date: March 22, 2019PAID $320.30 ON RECEIPT 2440200, FULLY PAID
Date: March 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF ZACHARY J MCCORMICK ON 9/15/22 TO 9/28/22 |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SET FOR 03/16/22 |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.