Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by White, in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with NIMETH, JASON J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNIMETH, JASON J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2020 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED
Date: June 03, 2021ORDER SETTING CASES FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: July 12, 2021BOND DISCHARGED
Date: March 19, 2021DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT
Date: July 20, 2021BOND DISCHARGED
Date: March 18, 2021ARREST AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER
Date: December 21, 2020INVESTIGATIVE COST REPORT
Date: December 21, 2020ARREST AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 21, 2020ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED
Date: December 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
CONSOLIDATE FROM INFORMATION OF 35-2020-MM-006296-AXXX-XX WITH 35-2020-CF-003196-AXXX-XX 35-2020-MM-006296-AXXX-XX 35-2020-CF-003196-AXXX-XX |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROSEQUI - TRANSFER/CONSOLIDATION | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASES FOR TRIAL & COP | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASES RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
CONTINUED TO 08/09/2021 8:30 AM TRI - JURY SELECTION / TRIAL WEEK 8/9/2021 8:30 AM TRI - JURY SELECTION / TRIAL WEEK NIMETH, JASON J |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
CONTINUED TO 08/02/2021 8:30 AM COP - CHANGE OF PLEA 8/2/2021 8:30 AM COP - CHANGE OF PLEA NIMETH, JASON J |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASES FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
SET ON PTC - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE DOCKET 7/20/2021 BEGINNING AT 1:30 PM PTC - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE 7/20/2021 1:30 PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.