Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Any And All Unknown Parties Claiming By Through Under Or Against Herein Named Individual Defendants Who Are Not Known To Be Dead Or Alive Whether Said Unknown Parties May Claim An Interest As Spouses Heirs Devisees Grantees Or Other Claimants, Tedman, Heidi Rene, Tedman, Jennifer Lynn, Tedman, Shawn Phillip, Unknown Tenants, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with Nacke, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNacke, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2018 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a verified complaint to foreclose a mortgage. The plaintiff, JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, is suing the defendants, Jennifer Lynn Tedman, Shawn Phillip Tedman, Heidi Rene Tedman, and any unknown parties claiming an inte...
SUMMONS ISSUED TO TEDMAN, JENNIFER LYNN
Date: June 15, 2018FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: August 28, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: June 14, 2018PAID $950.00 ON RECEIPT 2361819, FULLY PAID
Date: July 06, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED TO TEDMAN, HEIDI RENE
Date: June 15, 2018CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: August 28, 2018NOTICE
Date: August 28, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANTS,
Date: June 15, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED TO TEDMAN, SHAWN PHILLIP
Date: June 15, 2018VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM
Date: June 14, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 14, 2018PAID $951.00 ON RECEIPT 2361819, FULLY PAID
Date: June 15, 2018LIS PENDENS
Date: June 14, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: June 14, 2018TEXT
Date: June 14, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER DIRECTION FROM ADMINISTRATIVE JUDGE SEMENTO NACKE, MARK A SENIOR COVERAGE JUDGE, PER DIRECTION FROM ADMINISTRATIVE JUDGE SEMENTO |
|
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
PAID $950.00 ON RECEIPT 2361819, FULLY PAID $950.00 2361819 Fully Paid |
|
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | REVISED, RECEIPT NUMBER 2361819 | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO TEDMAN, JENNIFER LYNN TEDMAN, JENNIFER LYNN |
|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO TEDMAN, HEIDI RENE TEDMAN, HEIDI RENE |
|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANTS, UNKNOWN TENANTS, |
|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO TEDMAN, SHAWN PHILLIP TEDMAN, SHAWN PHILLIP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.