Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Government Employees Insurance Company Aso Tracey Dixson, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Ioime, James, in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with NACKE, MARK A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNACKE, MARK A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 14, 2018 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
PAID $410.00 ON RECEIPT 2335568, FULLY PAID
Date: March 15, 2018NOTICE OF DISMISSAL
Date: October 16, 2018SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO
Date: June 05, 2018SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO IOIME, JAMES / 03/27/2018
Date: April 04, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED TO IOIME, JAMES
Date: March 15, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: March 14, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 14, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: March 14, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO JAMES IOIME/ CAES NUMBER 6 18 BK 03159 |
|
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO IOIME, JAMES / 03/27/2018 IOIME, JAMES 03/27/2018 |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
PAID $410.00 ON RECEIPT 2335568, FULLY PAID $410.00 2335568 Fully Paid |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO IOIME, JAMES IOIME, JAMES |
|
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK | |
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.