Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with DAVIS, HEIDI presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 01, 2012 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - UNEXECUTED - FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILD(REN) (EXPIRES WITHOUT HEARING ON 5/13/2013) RETURNED UNEXECUTED BY LCSO | |
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER DISSOLVING INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION UPON RECEIPT OF MOTION FOR MODIFICATION WHEREIN THE PETITIONER REQUESTED DISMISSAL OF THE INJUNCTION; COPIES TO PARTIES BY MAIL; COPY TO LCSO VIA 10/2; FILED AND RECORDED | |
January 24, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGE'S REVIEW FORM REFERENCE PETITIONER MOTION TO DISMISS WITH INSTRUCTION FROM JUDGE DAVIS TO DISMISS WITHOUT HEARING | |
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR MODIFICATION FILED BY PETITIONER | |
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - EXECUTED - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (HEARING DATE 11/1/12) RETURNED SERVED INDIVIDUALLY ON THEODORE JOHNSON MOSS, III ON 11/1/12 BY LCSO | |
November 13, 2012 | Docket Event | INJUNCTION COURT SHEET - HEARING HELD NOVEMBER 1, 2012; PETITIONER PRESENT; RESPONDENT NOT PRESENT BUT SERVED; COURT ISSUED FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION FOR SIX MONTHS | |
November 13, 2012 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILD(REN); EXPIRES WITHOUT HEARING ON MAY 13, 2013; COPY TO PETITIONER BY HAND DELIVERY IN COURTROOM; COPIES FOR SERVICE TO LCSO VIA 10/2; FILED AND RECORDED | |
November 01, 2012 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN; HEARING SET FOR TUESDAY, NOVEMBER 13, 2012 AT 10:30 A.M. BEFORE JUDGE HEIDI DAVIS; COPIES TO PETITIONER BY MAIL; COPIES FOR SERVICE TO LCSO VIA 10/2 | |
November 01, 2012 | Docket Event | INJUNCTION HEARING SET FOR Event: INJUNCTION HEARING - CIVIL - TEMP Date: 11/13/2012 Time: 10:30 am Judge: DAVIS, HONORABLE HEIDI Location: COURTROOM TO BE DETERMINED | |
November 01, 2012 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S IDENTIFICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.