Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
M And T Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Singh, Devika, Singh, Ramchand, Singh Unknown Spouse, Ramchand, Unknown Tenant In Possession 1 Nka Brandon Hawthorne, Unknown Tenant In Possession 2, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with NACKE, MARK A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2012 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
MOTION
Date: December 19, 2013COVER LETTER DATED
Date: October 04, 2013MOTION
Date: April 22, 2013NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FILED BY
Date: April 11, 2013AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 11, 2013CASE NOTES:
Date: June 26, 2013MOTION
Date: September 30, 2013LIS PENDENS
Date: December 07, 2012COVER LETTER DATED
Date: June 26, 2013MOTION
Date: April 11, 2013AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Date: April 22, 2013ORDER
Date: October 04, 2013SUMMONS ISSUED TO
Date: December 08, 2012AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 22, 2013SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO /
Date: January 25, 2013NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR
Date: May 31, 2013COMPLAINT
Date: December 07, 2012SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO /
Date: December 19, 2012VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM
Date: December 07, 2012CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED
Date: January 09, 2014CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 07, 2012NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FILED BY
Date: April 22, 2013CERTIFICATION SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY
Date: December 07, 2012SUMMONS ISSUED TO
Date: December 08, 2012SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVICE AS TO
Date: January 25, 2013AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: April 22, 2013FAX OF
Date: October 01, 2013SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED
Date: June 26, 2013NOTICE OF FILING
Date: April 11, 2013AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: April 22, 2013SUMMONS ISSUED TO
Date: December 08, 2012MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO
Date: April 11, 2013MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT // DEFAULT NOT ENTERED AS TO
Date: April 30, 2013COVER LETTER DATED
Date: January 03, 2014ORDER
Date: January 03, 2014SUMMONS ISSUED TO
Date: December 08, 2012PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: July 23, 2013AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 22, 2013NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTIES NAMED AS
Date: April 22, 2013SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVICE AS TO
Date: December 19, 2012NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTIES NAMED AS
Date: April 11, 2013CLERK'S LETTER
Date: January 06, 2014NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE ISSUED
Date: June 26, 2013SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO /
Date: December 27, 2012SUMMONS ISSUED TO
Date: December 08, 2012SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE AS TO
Date: January 25, 2013SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE AS TO
Date: December 27, 2012FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: June 26, 2013PROPOSED DEFAULT
Date: April 22, 2013SUMMONS ISSUED TO
Date: December 08, 2012SUMMONS ISSUED TO
Date: December 08, 2012DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS
Date: December 07, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED ADDRESSED TO MCCALLA RAYMER LLC | |
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERK'S LETTER TO PLTF'S ATTY RETURNING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS VIA CERTIFIED MAIL | |
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER DATED DEC 18, 2013 RE MOTION TO VACATE | |
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE, RELEASE ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS, DISMISS FORECLOSURE ACTION, AND RELEASE LIS PENDENS // FILED AND RECORDED | |
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION PLTF'S MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT, RELEASE ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS, DISMISS FORECLOSURE ACTION AND RELEASE LIS PENDENS // REOPEN |
|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event | REOPEN FEE CIRCUIT CIVIL Receipt: 339772 Date: 12/24/2013 | |
October 04, 2013 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER DATED SEPTEMBER 30, 2013 FROM MCALLA RAYMER, LLC TO JUDGE REGARDING MOTION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALEL | |
October 04, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELING FORECLOSURE SALE // GRANTED // THE FORECLOSURE SALE SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 1, 2013 IS HEREBY CANCELED // SIGNED OCTOBER 4, 2013 | |
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FAX OF FAX RECEIVED FROM MCCALLA RAYMER, LLC (PLTF'S ATTORNEY) CANCELING SALE SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 1, 2013 |
|
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE CANCELLED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.