Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with SENIOR FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 01, 2012 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association against the defendants, Horris R. Trice and Nancy S. Trice, in the Circuit Court of the 5th Judicial Circuit in Lake County, Florida. The complaint alleges that...
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS
Date: December 30, 2014CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: August 07, 2014FORECLOSURE SALE BID SHEET WITH ATTACHED BIDDING DOCUMENTATION
Date: December 16, 2014CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Date: December 30, 2014PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: November 03, 2014FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: October 09, 2014CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: December 16, 2014FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: October 09, 2014NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE ISSUED
Date: October 13, 2014CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: August 07, 2014NOTICE OF FILING
Date: August 07, 2014NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR
Date: September 04, 2014COVER LETTER DATED
Date: October 09, 2014CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: August 07, 2014NOTICE OF FILING
Date: August 07, 2014COVER LETTER DATED
Date: August 07, 2014MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 07, 2014COVER LETTER DATED
Date: August 07, 2014ORDER
Date: June 05, 2014ORDER
Date: March 03, 2014MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO
Date: August 04, 2014CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2014MOTION FOR LEAVE
Date: June 04, 2014NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FILED BY
Date: August 04, 2014SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO /
Date: August 04, 2014COVER LETTER DATED
Date: March 03, 2014NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTIES NAMED AS
Date: February 26, 2014MOTION FOR DEFAULT // PROPOSED DEFAULT
Date: August 04, 2014AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: June 04, 2014MOTION
Date: February 26, 2014SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVICE AS TO
Date: December 14, 2012AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: June 04, 2013SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVICE AS TO
Date: December 14, 2012SUMMONS ISSUED TO
Date: November 05, 2012SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVICE AS TO
Date: December 14, 2012SUMMONS ISSUED TO
Date: November 05, 2012SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO /
Date: December 14, 2012SUMMONS ISSUED TO
Date: November 05, 2012CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 01, 2012SUMMONS ISSUED TO
Date: November 05, 2012COMPLAINT
Date: November 01, 2012VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM
Date: November 01, 2012LIS PENDENS
Date: November 01, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS | |
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION // FILED AND RECORDED | |
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE BID SHEET WITH ATTACHED BIDDING DOCUMENTATION | |
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE CIRCUIT Receipt: 368508 Date: 12/16/2014 | |
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE ISSUED TO JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (PLTF) WITH COPY OF PROOF ATTACHED // FOR BID OF $100.00 // FILED AND RECORDED // TITLE TO ISSUE DECEMBER 30, 2014 | |
November 03, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE PUBLISHED IN THE ORLANDO BUSINESS JOURNAL ON OCTOBER 24, 2014 AND OCTOBER 31, 2014 // SALE SET FOR DECEMBER 16, 2014 AT 11:00 AM | |
October 13, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE ISSUED AND MAILED TO THE ORLANDO BUSINESS JOURNAL FOR PUBLICATION // SALE SET FOR DECEMBER 16, 2014 AT 11:00 AM | |
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE $101,212.56 // SALE SET FOR DECEMBER 16, 2014 AT 11:00 AM // SIGNED OCTOBER 9, 2014 // FILED AND RECORDED | |
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER DATED UNDATED COVER LETTER FROM PHELAN HALLINAN, PLC TO CLERK REGARDING FINAL JUDGMENT PACKET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.