Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Green, Brittany Shanteez, The Department Of Revenue, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jennings, Derrick Devon, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts with Jacqueline Smith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RECOMMENDED ORDER ON FINAL JUDGMENT | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPTS FROM FATHER SHOWING WHAT HE HAS SPENT ON THE CHILDREN | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL INFORMATION FROM RESPONDENT FOR UPCOMING HEARING | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING AMENDED | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Event CSH scheduled on 6/23/2023 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JACQUELINE SMITH presiding. | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.