Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Roberts, Frank Iii, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Roberts, Angela K, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts with DAWN CALOCA-JOHNSON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | WIFE'S EXHIBIT LIST | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT HUSBAND | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT WIFE | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 7/10/2023 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge DAWN CALOCA-JOHNSON presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.