Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Castaneda, Alysia Marianna, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2017 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Referred to GC Services for Collections - FTP | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Collections Pending - FTP | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | 20 Day Collection Notice | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Agreement to Pay Traffic Violators School | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Time Payment Agreement with Fee - Felonies/Misdemeanors | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Traffic School Requested - Fees Attached | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Traffic School due date | |
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event | 20 Day Collection Notice | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.