Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Loveless, Deloyd, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Suwannee River Water Managemen, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2014 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER CLOSING CASE | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 16, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT SUWANEE RIVER WATER MANAGEMENT DISTRICT | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF DELOYD LOVELESS RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF DELOYD LOVELESS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT SUWANNEE RIVER WATER MANAGEMENT DISTRICT | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF DELOYD LOVELESS CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT SUWANNEE RIVER WATER MANAGEMENT DISTRICTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT SUWANNEE RIVER WATER MANAGEMENT DISTRICT NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT | |
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT SUWANNEE RIVER WATER MANAGEMENT DISTRICTS ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.