Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hpsc Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Cole, Steven, Cole, Cathleen, Steven Cole Cdt Inc, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2009 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness(Inactive) |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSED | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY RETURNED SERVED ON STEVEN COLE | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY RETURNED SERVED ON CATHLEEN COLE | |
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event | CAUSE | |
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY AND NOTICE OF HEARING TO SHOW | |
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLETION OF FACT INFORMATION SHEET | |
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS FEES | |
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST | |
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.